+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0371)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 371 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB538ER)
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Systems
On January 5, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102239D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 3, 2020: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2020: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2020: VOTE: (99-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2020: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Betsy B. Carr
Type:
Primary Sponsor