+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0127)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 127 (effective 7/1/10)
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB538ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 2, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2010 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 29, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: #2
On January 12, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100208D
+ − Votes (6)
February 23, 2010: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2010: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2010: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2010: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor