+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100148D
- Referred to Committee on General Laws