+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (50)
On March 30, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 689 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0689)
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB532ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Amended by conference committee
- Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 95-N)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 95-N)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- House acceded to request
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Dance, Chafin, Suetterlein
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Freitas, Poindexter, James
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106025D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB532H1
On February 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources & Technology
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18106025D-H1
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
On January 15, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned ACNRsub: Subcommittee #1
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100129D
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources