+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 22, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0229)
On March 16, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 229 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 28, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB531ER)
On February 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Read first time
On January 31, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (95-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 29, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Ches. & Its Tributaries (15-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Chesapeake and Its Tributaries
- Presented & ordered printed 960789132