+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0016)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 16 (effective 7/1/18)
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 26, 2018
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2018
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB53ER)
- Enrolled
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- Read third time
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 1-N)
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed House (96-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB53H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 18105885D-H1
- Read second time
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 18105885D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On December 1, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100446D
+ − Votes (6)
February 14, 2018: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
February 13, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 1-N)
February 2, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N 1-A)
January 29, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor