+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 11, 1998 in the House:
- Continued to 1999 in Finance (22-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On February 3, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (25-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. I. B. sub-committee: 4
On January 14, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/29/97 982723364
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
+ − Votes (2)
February 11, 1998: Continued to 1999 in Finance (22-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1998: Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (25-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor