+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 25, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0254)
On March 19, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 254 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 28, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB529ER)
On February 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
On January 30, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 26, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (22-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Presented & ordered printed 960990132
+ − Votes (5)
February 21, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1996: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
January 30, 1996: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 25, 1996: Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor