+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 14, 2008 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0724)
On March 27, 2008 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 724 (effective 7/1/08)
On March 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB526ER)
- Enrolled
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On March 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2008 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Professional/Occupational/Adminstrative Process
On January 7, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 083816668
+ − Votes (7)
March 5, 2008: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
March 5, 2008: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2008: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2008: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor