+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Left in Finance
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2019 in Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103323D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Votes (5)
March 1, 2018: Continued to 2019 in Finance (16-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor