+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 13, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0235)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 235 (effective 1/1/13)
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB523ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (37-Y 2-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 1-N)
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2012 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB523H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 12104921D-H1
- Read second time
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 12104921D-H1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101844D
+ − Votes (5)
February 23, 2012: Passed Senate (37-Y 2-N)
February 22, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2012: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 1-N)
February 13, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2012: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor