+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 17, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0412)
On April 12, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 412 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 31, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 30, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB521ER)
On March 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1998 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 986772114-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 10, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendment (23-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 3
On January 20, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented & ordered printed 986772114