+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 14, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0292)
On April 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Floor substitute printed 989764364-S1 (Marye)
On April 8, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 292 (effective 1/1/98)
On March 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 17, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB52ER)
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Substitute by Sen. Marye rejected (14-Y 21-N)
- VOTE: FLOOR SUBSTITUTE V (14-Y 21-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- Substitute by Sen. Marye reconsidered (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- Substitute by Sen. Marye rejected (14-Y 22-N 2-A)
- VOTE: FLOOR SUBSTITUTE V (14-Y 22-N 2-A)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (23-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On January 14, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/29/97 987256364
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Votes (10)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: FLOOR SUBSTITUTE V (14-Y 22-N 2-A)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: FLOOR SUBSTITUTE V (14-Y 21-N)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 3, 1998: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1998: Reported from Finance (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor