+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 25, 2016 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0468)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 468 (effective 7/1/16)
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016
On March 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB519ER)
- Enrolled
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB519H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 16105306D-H1
- Read second time
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 16105306D-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education
On January 9, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100516D
+ − Votes (8)
February 29, 2016: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 29, 2016: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 29, 2016: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2016: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2016: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2016: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor