+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 10, 2004 in the House:
- Stricken from House calendar
- VOTE: ADOPTION (60-Y 39-N)
- Committee amendment agreed to (60-Y 39-N)
- Read second time
On February 9, 2004 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 6, 2004 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendment (11-Y 10-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/13/04 047051364
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 10, 2004: VOTE: ADOPTION (60-Y 39-N)
February 4, 2004: Reported from Education with amendment (11-Y 10-N)
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor