+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0483)
On April 14, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 483 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 16, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB518ER)
On March 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Ed. & Health sub-committee: Higher Ed.
On February 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Education (24-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 4
On January 20, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented & ordered printed 983115114