+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0023)
On March 2, 2004 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 23 (effective 3/2/04)
On February 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB516ER)
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- Emergency clause added
- VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation w/amds (15-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 2, 2004 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 29, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (21-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Tra. sub-committee: 1
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/13/04 049804448
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 19, 2004: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2004: Reported from Transportation w/amds (15-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2004: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2004: Reported from Tra. (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor