+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 26, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0896)
On May 20, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 896 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- House rejected Gov's recommendation (27-Y 69-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (27-Y 69-N)
- Communicated to Governor
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 24, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 17, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB513ER)
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (88-Y 5-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 5-N)
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (24-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On January 20, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 989120727
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (27-Y 69-N)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 5-N)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 3, 1998: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: Reported from Finance (24-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor