+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
On April 30, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0974)
On April 17, 1996 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 974 (effective 7/1/96)
On April 17, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 17, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 17, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: AGREE TO GOV'S RECOMM. (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 17, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
On April 10, 1996 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 22, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 1996 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 13, 1996 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB512ER)
On February 28, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 26, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Read first time
On February 13, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 966361476-E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
On February 10, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from Appropriations with amds. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Education (19-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 3
On January 18, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented & ordered printed 966361476