+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0823)
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 823 (effective 7/1/18)
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N)
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB511ER2)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB511ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (34-Y 6-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 10-N)
- Read third time and passed House (86-Y 10-N)
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (17-Y 5-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 2-N)
On January 15, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100374D
+ − Votes (10)
April 18, 2018: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
April 18, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
April 18, 2018: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 21, 2018: Passed Senate (34-Y 6-N)
February 19, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2018: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 10-N)
February 6, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 2-N)
February 6, 2018: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (17-Y 5-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor