+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On April 26, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0899)
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOVERNOR'S RECOMM. (37-Y 1-N)
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (37-Y 1-N)
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 899 (effective 7/1/94)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 12, 1994 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 29, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 28, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 18, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB510ER)
On March 8, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (84-Y 13-N)
- Senate sub. w/amd. agreed to by House (84-Y 13-N)
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 4, 1994 in the Senate:
- Amendment by Sen. R. J. Holland agreed to
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Engrossed by Senate-comm. substitute/w amdt.
- Passed Senate with sub. w/amd. (32-Y 8-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (32-Y 8-N)
On March 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On March 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (37-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD7224605 (HB510S1)
- Reported from Finance with substitute (7-Y 6-N 1-A)
On February 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 13-N)
- Read third time and passed House (87-Y 13-N)
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD3524180 (HB510E)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 13, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amds. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented and ordered printed