+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2005 in Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd (15-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 3-N)
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 3-N)
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 045133388-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB510E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendments (20-Y 1-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/13/04 045133388
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 2, 2004: Continued to 2005 in Finance (15-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2004: Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd (15-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 3-N)
February 2, 2004: Reported from C. J. with amendments (20-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor