+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 484 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0484)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB507ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (31-Y 9-N)
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (11-Y 4-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (91-Y 7-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 7-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Education (20-Y 2-N)
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 2-N)
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103666D
- Referred to Committee on Education