+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 29, 2006 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Transportation (14-Y 0-N)
On September 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On September 28, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 1-N)
- Passed House (96-Y 1-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Printed as engrossed 066265536-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB5069E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On September 27, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On September 26, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
On September 18, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented and ordered printed 066265536
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
September 29, 2006: Passed by indefinitely in Transportation (14-Y 0-N)
September 28, 2006: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 1-N)
September 26, 2006: Reported from Transportation with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
L. Scott Lingamfelter
Type:
Primary Sponsor