+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (47)
On October 28, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0039)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 39 (effective 10/28/20)
On October 21, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 28, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on October 21, 2020
On October 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On October 16, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB5068ER)
- Enrolled
On October 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (36-Y 3-N)
On October 14, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Agreed To (83-Y 14-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (83-Y 14-N)
On October 13, 2020 in the House:
- Amended by conference committee
On October 7, 2020 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On October 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on substitute (34-Y 2-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On October 7, 2020 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Ayala, Sullivan, Adams, L.R.
On October 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senators: Surovell, Petersen, Chafin
On October 2, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Rejected (66-Y 27-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House (66-Y 27-N) (Requires 78 affirmative votes to pass)
On October 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute rejected
- Passed by temporarily
- Read third time
- Engrossed by Senate- floor substitute HB5068S2
- Reading of substitute waived
- Substitute by Senator Petersen agreed to
- Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 4-N)
- Floor substitute printed 20201273D-S2 (Petersen)
On September 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
On September 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N 2-A)
On September 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 20201176D-S1
- Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 0-N)
On September 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On September 4, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: (82-Y 16-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (82-Y 16-N)
On September 3, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB5068H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20201042D-H1
- Read second time
On August 28, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On August 26, 2020 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 20201042D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On August 18, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 20200825D
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 08/18/20 20200825D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (10)
October 14, 2020: Conference report agreed to by Senate (36-Y 3-N)
October 14, 2020: VOTE: Agreed To (83-Y 14-N)
October 7, 2020: Senate insisted on substitute (34-Y 2-N)
October 2, 2020: VOTE: Rejected (66-Y 27-N)
October 1, 2020: Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 4-N)
September 25, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
September 24, 2020: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N 2-A)
September 16, 2020: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 0-N)
September 4, 2020: VOTE: (82-Y 16-N)
August 26, 2020: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Hala S. Ayala
Type:
Primary Sponsor