+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 4, 1996 in the Senate:
- Continued to 1997 in Commerce and Labor (10-Y 3-N 2-A)
On February 5, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
On February 2, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 3-N)
- Read third time and passed House (92-Y 3-N)
On February 1, 1996 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 963478360-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 31, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from C. I. B. w/amd. (12-Y 5-N)
On January 18, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Presented & ordered printed 963478360
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 4, 1996: Continued to 1997 in Commerce and Labor (10-Y 3-N 2-A)
February 2, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 3-N)
January 30, 1996: Reported from C. I. B. w/amd. (12-Y 5-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor