+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On October 21, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0012)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 12 (effective 10/21/20)
On October 14, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 21, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on October 14, 2020
On October 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On October 7, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB5048ER)
- Enrolled
On October 2, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On September 29, 2020 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On September 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (35-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (36-Y 0-N)
On September 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
On September 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
On September 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Read first time
On August 28, 2020 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N)
On August 27, 2020 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 20200644D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB5048E
- Emergency clause added
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On August 26, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On August 25, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On August 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200644D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (8)
October 2, 2020: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N)
September 25, 2020: Passed Senate with amendment (35-Y 0-N)
September 25, 2020: Passed Senate with amendment (36-Y 0-N)
September 25, 2020: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N)
September 24, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
September 22, 2020: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
August 28, 2020: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Mark D. Sickles
Type:
Primary Sponsor