+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (44)
On November 9, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0044)
- Enacted, Chapter 44 (effective 11/9/20)
On November 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On November 9, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB5046ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Emergency clause added by Governor's recommendation
On November 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On November 9, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
On October 21, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On October 14, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 21, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on October 14, 2020
On October 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On October 7, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB5046ER)
- Enrolled
On October 2, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On September 29, 2020 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On September 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Passed Senate with amendments (36-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (35-Y 0-N)
On September 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
On September 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On September 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Read first time
On August 28, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
On August 27, 2020 in the House:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
- Engrossed bill reprinted 20200691D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB5046E
- Printed as engrossed 20200691D-E
On August 26, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On August 25, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On August 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200691D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (10)
November 9, 2020: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
November 9, 2020: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N)
October 2, 2020: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N)
September 25, 2020: Passed Senate with amendments (35-Y 0-N)
September 25, 2020: Passed Senate with amendments (36-Y 0-N)
September 25, 2020: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N)
September 24, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
September 22, 2020: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
August 28, 2020: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Dawn M. Adams
Type:
Primary Sponsor