+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 19, 2004 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0432)
On April 12, 2004 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 432 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 27, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 24, 2004 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 23, 2004 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB504ER)
On March 10, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds (15-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 13, 2004 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB504H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 040551368-H1
- Read second time
On February 11, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 2004 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 040551368-H1
On February 9, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/13/04 047284508
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 10, 2004: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
March 9, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
March 9, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 8, 2004: Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds (15-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2004: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2004: Reported from C. J. with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor