+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 5, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0337)
On March 30, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 337 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 6, 2006 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB504ER)
On February 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 26, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2006 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 064226216-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB504E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 24, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 23, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 064226216
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
February 27, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2006: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2006: Reported from Education with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor