+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 22, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1207)
On April 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 1-N)
On April 22, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (54-Y 41-N)
- VOTE: (54-Y 41-N)
- Enacted, Chapter 1207 (effective 7/1/20)
On April 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB504ER2)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 12, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2020
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB504ER)
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (26-Y 10-N)
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (10-Y 5-N)
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (69-Y 30-N)
- Read third time and passed House (69-Y 30-N)
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 20102168D-E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended HB504E
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (19-Y 3-N)
On January 20, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N)
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake
On January 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102168D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (10)
April 22, 2020: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
April 22, 2020: VOTE: (54-Y 41-N)
April 22, 2020: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2020: Passed Senate (26-Y 10-N)
February 20, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2020: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (10-Y 5-N)
January 28, 2020: VOTE: Passage (69-Y 30-N)
January 22, 2020: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (19-Y 3-N)
January 20, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Patrick A. Hope
Type:
Primary Sponsor