+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 13, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0084)
On March 10, 2000 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 84 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB501ER)
On February 21, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (38-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 11, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2000 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 005599612-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Title replaced
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 9, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. w/amds (25-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to Tra. sub-committee: 3
On January 18, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 005599612