+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 17, 2004 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0085)
On March 12, 2004 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0085)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 85 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 5, 2004 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB501ER)
On February 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N 1-A)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (36-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB501H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 043471260-H1
- Read second time
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 043471260-H1
On February 3, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/13/04 046402260