+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 11, 2010 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0555)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 555 (effective 7/1/10)
On March 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 22, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB500ER)
- Enrolled
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 10105487D-S1 (95-Y 1-N)
On March 10, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (35-Y 5-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB500S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 10105487D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On March 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 4-N)
- Committee substitute printed 10105487D-S1
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB500H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 10104401D-H1
- Read second time
On February 12, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 10104401D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On January 12, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101779D
+ − Votes (7)
March 11, 2010: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N)
March 10, 2010: Passed Senate with substitute (35-Y 5-N)
March 9, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
March 8, 2010: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 4-N)
February 16, 2010: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2010: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor