+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 30, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 432 (effective 7/1/12)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0432)
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB500ER)
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N)
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB500H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 12104865D-H1
On February 10, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 12104865D-H1
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: #2
On January 10, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102795D
+ − Votes (8)
February 28, 2012: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N)
February 24, 2012: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2012: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor