+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 384 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0384)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB50ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106790D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB50H1
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18106790D-H1
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100461D
- Referred to Committee on Education