+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 6, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0656)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 656 (effective 7/1/12)
On March 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB496ER)
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 12105744D-S1 (97-Y 1-N)
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB496S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 12105744D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On March 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 12105744D-S1
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health Care
On January 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 24, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB496H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 12104355D-H1
- Read second time
On January 20, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 12104355D-H1
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: #2
On January 10, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102709D
+ − Votes (7)
March 7, 2012: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N)
March 5, 2012: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor