+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0040)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 40 (effective 7/1/18)
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB495ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB495H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 18105688D-H1
- Read second time
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 18105688D-H1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (9-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102628D
+ − Votes (6)
February 16, 2018: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2018: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2018: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor