+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Continued to 1999 in Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Criminal Law & Procedure
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
- Pursuant to S.Rule 20(j),rerefer. by Trans. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 8-N)
- Read third time and passed House (84-Y 8-N)
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 981954487-E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. w/amds. (19-Y 6-N)
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Tra. sub-committee: 3
On January 19, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 981954487