+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 30, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0430)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 430 (effective 7/1/12)
On March 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB492ER)
- Enrolled
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (29-Y 10-N)
- Read third time
On March 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Requires 2/3 affirmative votes of members elected for passage
- Defeated by Senate (26-Y 13-N)
- Read third time
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (10-Y 5-N)
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 18-N)
- Read third time and passed House (81-Y 18-N)
On January 24, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (18-Y 3-N)
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: #1
On January 10, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102753D
+ − Votes (8)
March 5, 2012: Passed Senate (29-Y 10-N)
March 2, 2012: Defeated by Senate (26-Y 13-N)
March 1, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2012: Reported from Local Government (10-Y 5-N)
January 25, 2012: VOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 18-N)
January 20, 2012: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (18-Y 3-N)
January 18, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor