+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 6, 2020 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 745 (effective 7/1/20)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0745)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB491ER)
- Enrolled
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Read third time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Passed Senate with amendments (37-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (36-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (36-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (13-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Hemp
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB491H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20106384D-H1
- Read second time
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 20106384D-H1
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Agriculture
On January 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100900D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (11)
March 2, 2020: VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2020: Passed Senate with amendments (37-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2020: Passed Senate with amendments (36-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2020: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2020: Passed Senate with amendments (36-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2020: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2020: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (13-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2020: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2020: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Daniel W. Marshall, III
Type:
Primary Sponsor