+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 761 (effective 7/1/12)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 0-N)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0761)
On April 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB491ER2)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 17, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 9, 2012 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB491ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (11-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: #2
On January 10, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103223D