+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 10, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0056)
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 56 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 1, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 22, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB489ER)
On February 21, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 2, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 6-N)
- Read third time and passed House (91-Y 6-N)
On February 1, 1994 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 31, 1994 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD1854450 (HB489E)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 28, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from R. & I. N. w/amd. (19-Y 2-N)
On January 24, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented and ordered printed