+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 21, 2004 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0791)
On April 14, 2004 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 791 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 21, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 19, 2004 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB485ER)
On March 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 17, 2004 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 16, 2004 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB485H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 042594260-H1
- Read second time
On February 14, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 13, 2004 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 042594260-H1
- Reported from C. C. T. with sub (22-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Reported from Appropriations with sub (25-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to App. sub-committee: 4
On January 22, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Referred from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/13/04 043913272
+ − Votes (7)
March 2, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2004: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
February 13, 2004: Reported from C. C. T. with sub (22-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2004: Reported from Appropriations with sub (25-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2004: Referred from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor