+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 316 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0316)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB484ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 18107158D-S1 (83-Y 14-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 14-N)
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107158D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB484S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 3-N)
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 18107158D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (79-Y 20-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 20-N)
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106597D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB484H1
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 3-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18106597D-H1
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102534D
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice