+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (47)
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0524)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 524 (effective 7/1/18)
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate reprinted (HB482ER)
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB482ER)
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N)
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (31-Y 6-N)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Amended by conference committee
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Delegates: Bell, Robert B., Gilbert, Herring
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senators: McDougle, Stuart, Howell
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House 18107096D-S1 (0-Y 98-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Placed on Calendar
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (31-Y 9-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB482S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107096D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 18107096D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 6-N)
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB482H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 18105729D-H1
- Read second time
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 18105729D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104420D
+ − Votes (10)
March 8, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
March 7, 2018: Conference report agreed to by Senate (31-Y 6-N)
February 22, 2018: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2018: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N)
February 14, 2018: Passed Senate with substitute (31-Y 9-N)
February 13, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 6-N)
February 2, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor