+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: DEFEATED (47-Y 50-N)
- Read third time and defeated by House (47-Y 50-N)
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB48H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 16105392D-H1
- Read second time
On February 13, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 16105392D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 10-N)
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 3-N)
On January 18, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 3-N)
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On November 25, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100574D