+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0168)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 168 (effective 7/1/16)
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 3, 2016
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 02/25/16
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB472ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB472H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 16104721D-H1
- Read second time
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 16104721D-H1
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Agriculture
On January 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103389D
+ − Votes (6)
February 23, 2016: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2016: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2016: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2016: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor