+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Finance
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Referred from Commerce and Labor by voice vote
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Finance
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments by voice vote
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 7, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103342D
+ − Vote
February 2, 2018: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor