+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On May 14, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0828)
On April 29, 1998 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB471ER)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. R (39-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (97-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 2-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 828 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 20, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB471ER)
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Ed. & Health sub-committee: Public Education
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 987552204-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amds. (29-Y 0-N)
- Read first time
On February 9, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendments (23-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 1
On January 19, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 987552204
- Referred to Committee on Education
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. R (39-Y 0-N)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 2-N)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 6, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
March 5, 1998: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1998: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: Reported from Appropriations with amds. (29-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1998: Reported from Education with amendments (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor